RI S2614 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires that a death certificate reflect the decedent’s gender identity, as reported by the next of kin.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vital Records

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - Passage (Y: 62 N: 2 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Vital records approval of amendment (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-28HouseSigned by Governor
2018-06-26HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-23SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2018-06-23SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-22HouseHouse passed Sub A
2018-06-21HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/22/2018)
2018-06-20HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-06-19HouseScheduled for consideration (06/20/2018)
2018-06-13HouseReferred to House Judiciary
2018-06-12SenateSenate passed as amended (floor amendment)
2018-06-06SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/12/2018)
2018-06-05SenateCommittee recommends passage
2018-06-01SenateScheduled for consideration (06/05/2018)
2018-05-17SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-05-11SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/17/2018)
2018-03-01SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback