RI S2610 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-09 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-09 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits the division of motor vehicles to refuse to register or transfer the registration of a vehicle which is subject to unpaid tolls.
Title
Registration Suspension For Failure To Pay Tolls
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-18 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-09 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2016-06-17 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-14 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2016-06-12 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2016) |
2016-06-02 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/01/2016) |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/17/2016) |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2016) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |