RI S2610 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Make it a felony to knowingly disseminate the electronic transmission of indecent materials to minors and would subject those offenders to the Sexual Offender Registration and Community Notification Act.
Title
Relating To Criminal Offenses
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Adam Satchell [D] | Sen. Paul Jabour [D] |
Sen. William Conley [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage *************************** (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-03 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-07-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-20 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-20 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/18/2014) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/11/2014) |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |