RI S2610 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Waters And Navigation - Obstructions To Navigation (would Allow The Authorized Public Entity To Use Or Dispose Of Derelict Or Abandoned Vessels Without Further Notice To Any Owners)
Title
An Act Relating To Waters And Navigation - Obstructions To Navigation (would Allow The Authorized Public Entity To Use Or Dispose Of Derelict Or Abandoned Vessels Without Further Notice To Any Owners)
Sponsors
Sen. David Bates [R] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] |
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-06-15 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-06-12 | House passed Sub A in concurrence | |
2012-06-12 | Placed on House Calendar (06/12/2012) | |
2012-06-12 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence | |
2012-06-11 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/12/2012) | |
2012-06-11 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/11/2012) | |
2012-06-04 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-06-01 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/04/2012) | |
2012-05-31 | Referred to House Finance | |
2012-05-31 | Senate passed Sub A | |
2012-05-29 | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/31/2012) | |
2012-05-29 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2012-05-25 | Scheduled for consideration (05/29/2012) | |
2012-03-21 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-03-15 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2012) | |
2012-03-01 | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/SenateText12/S2610.pdf |