RI S2608 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-29 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-29 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- OFFICE OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES - Requires executive office of health and human services to establish an early childhood mental health hub program focused on improving access to infant and early childhood mental health services for children under age 6 and their families.
Title
Requires executive office of health and human services to establish an early childhood mental health hub program focused on improving access to infant and early childhood mental health services for children under age 6 and their families.
Sponsors
Sen. Alana DiMario [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Pamela Lauria [D] | Sen. Sandra Cano [D] |
Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] | Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-28 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-29 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/28/2024) |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2024-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/21/2024) |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/30/2024) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |