RI S2603 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes special requirements for fiscal impact statements relative to the department of corrections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fiscal Notes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-24 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25HouseReferred to House Finance
2018-05-24SenateSenate passed Sub A
2018-05-22SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (05/24/2018)
2018-05-17SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-05-11SenateScheduled for consideration (05/17/2018)
2018-03-08SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-02SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2018)
2018-03-01SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback