RI S2602 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2016 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-06-02 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Allows RI bridge/turnpike authority to hold all proceedings without reasonable notice, disregard the rules of evidence, negate holding decisions/necessity of written final orders in all proceedings relating to toll amounts/fees toll violators/evaders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Administrative Procedures

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-06-01 - Passage (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-02HouseReferred to House Judiciary
2016-06-01SenateSenate passed Sub A
2016-05-24SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/01/2016)
2016-05-17SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2016-05-13SenateScheduled for consideration (05/17/2016)
2016-03-29SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2016-03-25SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2016)
2016-02-25SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback