RI S2601 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-05 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-05 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require the department of children, youth and families to provide the family court with transition plans and the child would continue under the jurisdiction of the family court until he or she turns twenty-one (21) years of age.
Title
Proceedings In Family Court
Sponsors
Sen. Catherine Rumsey [D] | Sen. Catherine Rumsey [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] |
Sen. Adam Satchell [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to House Finance |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/05/2014) |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/01/2014) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/15/2014) |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |