RI S2594 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-27 - Referred to House Labor
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-27 - Referred to House Labor
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Public Property And Works - Labor And Payment By Contractors (would Provide That Each Bidder, Prior To The Award Of A Contract For Public Works, Would Submit To The Proper Authority A List Of His Or Her Subcontractors Of Any Part Of All Of The Work)
Title
An Act Relating To Public Property And Works - Labor And Payment By Contractors (would Provide That Each Bidder, Prior To The Award Of A Contract For Public Works, Would Submit To The Proper Authority A List Of His Or Her Subcontractors Of Any Part Of All Of The Work)
Sponsors
Sen. David Bates [R] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Michael Pinga [D] | Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] |
Sen. John Tassoni [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-27 | Referred to House Labor | |
2010-05-26 | Senate passed Sub A | |
2010-05-20 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2010-05-19 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2010-05-19 | Scheduled for consideration | |
2010-04-14 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2010-04-14 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-02-11 | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/SenateText10/S2594.pdf |