RI S2592 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands the state's net metering policy to include renewable energy projects in which energy is distributed off-site from a customer's account and would establish an energy system credit benefit or charge.
Title
Net Metering
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] |
Sen. Nicholas Kettle [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/17/2016) |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/09/2016) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/SenateText16/S2592.pdf |