RI S2589 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Senate Resolution Respectfully Urging Congress To Restore Free And Fair Elections In The United States

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Senate Resolution Respectfully Urging Congress To Restore Free And Fair Elections In The United States

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-06-17 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-17SenateSenate read and passed
2016-06-17SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/17/2016)
2016-06-17SenateCommittee recommends passage
2016-06-17SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/17/2016)
2016-06-17SenateCommittee transferred to Senate Finance
2016-03-30SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2016-03-25SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/30/2016)
2016-02-25SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback