RI S2586 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allow for the probation and parole unit of the department of corrections to seek permission from the superior or district court to modify a defendant's conditions of probation to more effectively supervise the defendant.
Title
Sentence And Execution
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-15 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-07-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-21 | Senate | House passed in concurrence |
2014-06-21 | Senate | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/18/2014) |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/01/2014) |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |