RI S2577 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires health insurance policies to reimburse telemedicine services.
Title
Telemedicine Coverage Reimbursement Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-18 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2016-06-17 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-16 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2016-06-16 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/16/2016) |
2016-06-16 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/15/2016) |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/07/2016) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2016) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |