RI S2575 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-12 - Senate passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-12 - Senate passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study Potential Reform Of Vicious Dogs Hearings (creates A 10 Member Commission To Study Potential Reform Of Vicious Dogs Hearings, And Who Would Report Back To The General Assembly By March 1, 2019, And Expire On July 1, 2019.)
Title
Senate Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study Potential Reform Of Vicious Dogs Hearings (creates A 10 Member Commission To Study Potential Reform Of Vicious Dogs Hearings, And Who Would Report Back To The General Assembly By March 1, 2019, And Expire On July 1, 2019.)
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. James Seveney [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] |
Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-12 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/12/2018) |
2018-06-05 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-06-01 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/05/2018) |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2018) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |