RI S2564 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows Dr. Ryan Matthew Marnane to join Katrina Marie Holmstedt and Robert James DiMarino in marriage on or about May 7, 2022, within the Town of South Kingstown, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-12 - House - Solemnization Of Marriage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-04-12 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2022-04-08 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/12/2022) |
2022-03-29 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2022-03-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2022) |
2022-03-23 | House | Referred to House Special Legislation |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (03/22/2022) |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/15/2022) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |