RI S2554 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - Referred to House Municipal Government
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - Referred to House Municipal Government
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Rhode Island Livable Home Modification Grant allowing individuals to retrofit their residence to nationally recognized accessibility standards and receive fifty percent (50%) of the total sum spent, up to five thousand dollars ($5,000).
Title
Rhode Island Livable Home Modification Act
Sponsors
Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] |
Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-29 - Senate - Ri livable home modification act approval of amendment (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/29/2018) |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/22/2018) |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2018) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |