RI S2547 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a workload study for social caseworkers II in the division of developmental disabilities within BHDDH. The study would be completed within one year and the results reported to the general assembly.
Title
Division Of Developmental Disabilities
Sponsors
Sen. Meghan Kallman [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Alana DiMario [D] | Sen. Sandra Cano [D] |
Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] | Sen. James Seveney [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Melissa Murray [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/15/2022) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/SenateText22/S2547.pdf |