RI S2547 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-15 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-15 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that information provided to the attorney general pursuant to an investigative demand not be made public beyond the extent necessary to enforce fair trade practices. Would negate requirement that such material be filed in superior court.
Title
Relating To Commercial Law-general Regulatory Provisions-deceptive Trade Practices
Sponsors
Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] |
Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-15 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-15 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/15/2016) |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/02/2016) |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2016) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |