RI S2541 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows a pharmacist to dispense a partial fill of a Schedule II controlled substance at the request of the patient or the prescriber.
Title
Pharmacies--partial Fills
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-23 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 25 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-23 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2018-06-23 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2018) |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018) |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/22/2018) |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Committee transferred to Senate Judiciary |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2018) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |