RI S2540 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Includes behavioral health counseling visits and medication maintenance visits as primary care visits for patient cost-sharing requirements under the provisions of a health plan.
Title
Insurance Coverage For Mental Illness And Substance Abuse
Sponsors
Sen. James Seveney [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] |
Sen. Jeanine Calkin [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-22 - Senate - Illness and substance abuse approval of amendment (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-22 | House | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2018-06-22 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/22/2018) |
2018-06-22 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2018-06-22 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/22/2018) |
2018-06-22 | House | Committee transferred to House Finance |
2018-05-23 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/22/2018) |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/15/2018) |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2018) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |