RI S2520 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-05 - Senate passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-05 - Senate passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Resolution Respectfully Requesting The Rhode Island Resource Recovery Corporation To Plan And Carry Out A Pilot Program For The Safe Removal Of Sharps (this Act Would Require Hospitals And Pharmacies To Provide Sharps Containers For Public Use.)
Title
Senate Resolution Respectfully Requesting The Rhode Island Resource Recovery Corporation To Plan And Carry Out A Pilot Program For The Safe Removal Of Sharps (this Act Would Require Hospitals And Pharmacies To Provide Sharps Containers For Public Use.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-05 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/05/2014) |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/03/2014) |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/13/2014) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |