RI S2516 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
EDUCATION -- HEALTH AND SAFETY OF PUPILS - Requires RIDE to develop type 1 diabetes informational materials for the parents and guardians of students that will be posted publicly on RIDE's website.
Title
Requires RIDE to develop type 1 diabetes informational materials for the parents and guardians of students that will be posted publicly on RIDE's website.
Sponsors
Sen. Pamela Lauria [D] | Sen. Melissa Murray [D] | Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Matthew LaMountain [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2024) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2516.pdf |