RI S2514 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-15 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-15 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Motor And Other Vehicles -- Automobile Airbag Fraud Prevention Act (would Establish Penalties For Fraudulent Installation Or Reinstallation Of An Airbag In A Motor Vehicle)
Title
An Act Relating To Motor And Other Vehicles -- Automobile Airbag Fraud Prevention Act (would Establish Penalties For Fraudulent Installation Or Reinstallation Of An Airbag In A Motor Vehicle)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-15 | Effective without Governor's signature | |
2010-09-07 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-06-11 | House passed as amended in concurrence | |
2010-06-11 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2010-06-11 | Senate passed as amended | |
2010-06-10 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2010-06-10 | Committee recommends passage as amended | |
2010-06-10 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-04-14 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2010-04-14 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-02-11 | Introduced, referred to Senate Constitutional and Regulatory Issues |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/SenateText10/S2514.pdf |