RI S2500 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the office of energy resources to conduct a study to verify the energy savings measures from the state energy efficiency programs.
Title
Public Utilities Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-28 | House | Signed by Governor |
2018-06-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Senate passed Sub B in concurrence |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018) |
2018-06-22 | House | House passed Sub B |
2018-06-22 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/22/2018) |
2018-06-21 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub B |
2018-06-21 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/21/2018) |
2018-06-20 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/19/2018) |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-06-08 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/12/2018) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/05/2018) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |