RI S2500 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends timeframes and procedures for appeals in the zoning enabling act and land development and subdivision review enabling act, and shortens the time for, and number of, appeals during the planning board of review process.
Title
Relating To Towns And Cities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-30 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/30/2016) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/SenateText16/S2500.pdf |