RI S2499 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that no health insurer issuing a policy which provides coverage for prescription drugs shall exclude coverage of any off-label drug used for the treatment of disabling or life-threatening chronic disease.
Title
Off-label Uses Of Prescription Drugs
Sponsors
Sen. William Walaska [D] | Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] |
Sen. Dennis Algiere [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-14 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-06-14 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Senate passed Sub B in concurrence |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/14/2016) |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub B in concurrence |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/07/2016) |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
2016-06-01 | House | House passed Sub B |
2016-05-27 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/01/2016) |
2016-05-24 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub B |
2016-05-20 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/24/2016) |
2016-05-13 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/12/2016) |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/05/2016) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/03/2016) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |