RI S2498 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Redefines the type of advanced training and experience that is needed for pharmacists to engage in collaborative practice and provides for biennial review of collaborative practice agreements.
Title
Collaborative Pharmacy Practice
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-07 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-07 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2016-06-03 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/07/2016) |
2016-05-18 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2016-05-13 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/18/2016) |
2016-05-13 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/12/2016) |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/05/2016) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/03/2016) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |