RI S2494 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-11-18 - Committee heard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates a new income tax bracket of 6.99% on taxable income over five hundred thousand dollars. Any tax collected on this income deposited into restricted receipt account and expended on education for grades kindergarten through twelfth grade.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Personal Income Tax

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-18SenateCommittee heard
2020-11-13SenateScheduled for hearing (11/18/2020)
2020-02-25SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Finance

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback