RI S2480 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Health And Safety - Licensing Of Health Care Facilities
Title
An Act Relating To Health And Safety - Licensing Of Health Care Facilities
Sponsors
Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Harold Metts [D] | Sen. Rhoda Perry [D] |
Sen. Juan Pichardo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-18 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-06-12 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-06-12 | Senate passed Sub B in concurrence | |
2012-06-11 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/12/2012) | |
2012-06-11 | House passed Sub B | |
2012-06-08 | Placed on House Calendar (06/11/2012) | |
2012-06-08 | Committee recommends passage of Sub B | |
2012-06-06 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/08/2012) | |
2012-05-31 | Referred to House Corporations | |
2012-05-30 | Senate passed Sub A | |
2012-05-24 | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/30/2012) | |
2012-05-23 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2012-05-21 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/23/2012) | |
2012-04-11 | Committee continued | |
2012-04-06 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2012) | |
2012-02-16 | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/SenateText12/S2480.pdf |