RI S2473 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-18 - Senate passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-18 - Senate passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Extends full pay and benefits coverage for corrections personnel to injuries suffered during off duty emergencies and travel.
Title
Rhode Island Justice Commission
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Adam Satchell [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. William Walaska [D] |
Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-18 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2016) |
2016-06-17 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/17/2016) |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Committee transferred to Senate Finance |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/27/2016) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |