RI S2453 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows members of the retirement system who served in the national guard or reserves and who qualify as veterans to purchase retirement service credits.
Title
Retirement System--membership And Service Credits
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. James Seveney [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] |
Sen. Melissa Murray [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/17/2022) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/SenateText22/S2453.pdf |