RI S2453 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes Rhode Island Student Loan Authority to refinance loans and invest in its own bonds.
Title
Student Loan Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-18 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-07 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2016-06-17 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-01 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/31/2016) |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/24/2016) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |