RI S2450 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $300,000 From The American Rescue Plan Act Funds For The Blackstone Valley Tourism Council (this Joint Resolution Would Authorize The Appropriation Of The Sum Of Three Hundred Thousand Dollars ($300,000) To The Blackstone Valley Tourism Council.)
Title
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $300,000 From The American Rescue Plan Act Funds For The Blackstone Valley Tourism Council (this Joint Resolution Would Authorize The Appropriation Of The Sum Of Three Hundred Thousand Dollars ($300,000) To The Blackstone Valley Tourism Council.)
Sponsors
Sen. Jonathon Acosta [D] | Sen. Meghan Kallman [D] | Sen. Melissa Murray [D] | Sen. Roger Picard [D] |
Sen. Sandra Cano [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2022) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/SenateText22/S2450.pdf |