RI S2450 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits the electronic dissemination of images, without consent, of another engaged in sexually explicit conduct or the intimate parts of another, where a reasonable person knows or understands that the image was to remain private.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electronic Imaging Devices

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-23SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2018)
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback