RI S2441 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modify the definition of construction and demolition (C&D) debris to include concrete when and if transported to a constitution and demolition debris processing facility.
Title
Refuse Disposal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-19 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/19/2014) |
2014-06-18 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-17 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-16 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-06-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/16/2014) |
2014-05-22 | House | Referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/21/2014) |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/14/2014) |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/07/2014) |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/02/2014) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |