RI S2439 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the amount of purchases the North Providence's purchasing agent may purchase an item, without bid, from $1,500 to $2,500.
Title
Amending The Charter Of North Providence
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] | Sen. Thomas Paolino [R] | Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] |
Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-05-10 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2018-05-08 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/10/2018) |
2018-05-08 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2018-05-04 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/08/2018) |
2018-05-03 | House | Committee transferred to House Municipal Government |
2018-03-23 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/22/2018) |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2018) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |