RI S2439 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides a declaration that the state's policy will be to make strategic investments in the region's energy resources and infrastructure. PUC to approve proposals to advance this policy
Title
Relating To Public Utilities And Carriers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Approval of amendment lc 004570/2 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage as amended in concurrence (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage as amended in concurrence (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-07-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-19 | House | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2014-06-19 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/19/2014) |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/12/2014) |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Committee recommended indefinite postponement |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/04/2014) |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/09/2014) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |