RI S2430 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates "Consumer Privacy Protection Act."
Title
Consumer Privacy Protection
Sponsors
Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Mark McKenney [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] |
Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/03/2020) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/SenateText20/S2430.pdf |