RI S2421 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-02 - Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-02 - Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Labor --overtime Pay (would Provide That The Overtime Pay Of Delivery Drivers/sales Merchandisers Would Be Subject To Subdivision 28-12-4.3(a)(7) Which Makes The Driver/sales Merchandiser Seek An Hourly Rate Subject To Regulations Of Us Dot)
Title
An Act Relating To Labor --overtime Pay (would Provide That The Overtime Pay Of Delivery Drivers/sales Merchandisers Would Be Subject To Subdivision 28-12-4.3(a)(7) Which Makes The Driver/sales Merchandiser Seek An Hourly Rate Subject To Regulations Of Us Dot)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study | |
2012-05-02 | Committee recommended indefinite postponement | |
2012-04-27 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/02/2012) | |
2012-02-15 | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/SenateText12/S2421.pdf |