RI S2396 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the tax sale of properties when litigation is pending disputing the amount owed.
Title
Collection Of Taxes Generally
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Paolino [R] | Sen. Jessica de la Cruz [R] | Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] |
Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. James Seveney [D] | Sen. Gordon Rogers [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/10/2022) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/SenateText22/S2396.pdf |