RI S2391 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-21 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-21 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
BUSINESSES AND PROFESSIONS -- OPTICIANS -- QUALIFICATIONS - Establishes a second avenue of qualification as an optician, to include successfully completing an apprenticeship program.
Title
Establishes a second avenue of qualification as an optician, to include successfully completing an apprenticeship program.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Robert Britto [D] | Sen. Alana DiMario [D] |
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2024) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Subjects
Businesses And Professions
BUSINESSES AND PROFESSIONS -- OPTICIANS
BUSINESSES AND PROFESSIONS -- OPTICIANS -- QUALIFICATIONS
BUSINESSES AND PROFESSIONS -- OPTICIANS
BUSINESSES AND PROFESSIONS -- OPTICIANS -- QUALIFICATIONS
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2391.pdf |