RI S2382 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allows the Tiverton town council to grant, by ordinance, property tax credits and removes the current property assessment value-based tax exemptions for veterans, gold star parents and visually impaired persons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property Subject To Taxation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-12 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20SenateEffective without Governor's signature
2018-06-12SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-12HouseHouse passed in concurrence
2018-06-08HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/12/2018)
2018-06-07HouseCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2018-06-02HouseScheduled for consideration (06/07/2018)
2018-06-02HouseCommittee transferred to House Municipal Government
2018-05-04HouseReferred to House Finance
2018-05-03SenateSenate read and passed
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (05/03/2018)
2018-04-26SenateCommittee recommends passage
2018-04-24SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2018)
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Finance

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback