RI S2381 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits a landlord from inquiring about the immigration status of a tenant subject to any federal laws or regulations, but may request financial information or proof of identity.
Title
Residential Landlord And Tenant Act--immigration Status
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/10/2022) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/SenateText22/S2381.pdf |