RI S2379 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Remove the state's prohibition on adults using, possessing, and cultivating marijuana for personal use. It establishes a system of regulated marijuana retail distribution to adults 21 and older & imposes taxes at both the wholesale and retail level
Title
Relating To Food And Drugs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/03/2014) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/SenateText14/S2379.pdf |