RI S2377 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-24 - Referred to House Labor
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-24 - Referred to House Labor
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Labor And Labor Relations -- Establishing Back To Work Rhode Island Program Act Of 2012 (would Assist Employers And Potential Employees By Creating The Back To Work Ri Program.)
Title
An Act Relating To Labor And Labor Relations -- Establishing Back To Work Rhode Island Program Act Of 2012 (would Assist Employers And Potential Employees By Creating The Back To Work Ri Program.)
Sponsors
Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Rhoda Perry [D] |
Sen. John Tassoni [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-24 | Referred to House Labor | |
2012-05-24 | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) | |
2012-05-17 | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/24/2012) | |
2012-05-16 | Committee recommends passage | |
2012-05-11 | Scheduled for consideration (05/16/2012) | |
2012-03-21 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-03-15 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2012) | |
2012-02-14 | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/SenateText12/S2377.pdf |