RI S2363 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-18 - Meeting postponed (06/18/2020)
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-18 - Meeting postponed (06/18/2020)
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the sunset provision of chapter 33.6 of title 44 which grants tax credits to individuals or companies redeveloping historic structures.
Title
Historic Preservation Tax Credits 2013
Sponsors
Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Adam Satchell [D] | Sen. Sandra Cano [D] |
Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-18 | Senate | Meeting postponed (06/18/2020) |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/SenateText20/S2363.pdf |