RI S2363 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates the requirement that a waiver for fuel content standards be obtained from both weights and measures (DLT) and the department of environmental management (DEM).
Title
Retail Sale Of Gasoline
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] |
Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-13 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2018-06-08 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/13/2018) |
2018-05-29 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2018-05-25 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/29/2018) |
2018-05-03 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/02/2018) |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/25/2018) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2018) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |