RI S2361 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that jurisdiction of all use of agricultural and vegetable seeds is vested exclusively in the director of the department of environmental management.
Title
Rhode Island Seed Act
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] |
Sen. Walter Felag [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-22 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-22 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2018-06-22 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/22/2018) |
2018-06-21 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2018-06-21 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/21/2018) |
2018-06-21 | House | Committee transferred to House Corporations |
2018-04-06 | House | Referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/05/2018) |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (03/28/2018) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2018) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |