RI S2361 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Health And Safety (would Provide A Statutory Framework For Administration Of Medical Orders For Life Sustaining Treatment Or Molst With Respect To Terminally Ill Patients.)
Title
An Act Relating To Health And Safety (would Provide A Statutory Framework For Administration Of Medical Orders For Life Sustaining Treatment Or Molst With Respect To Terminally Ill Patients.)
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Devall [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] | Sen. Rhoda Perry [D] |
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-11 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-06-07 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-06-07 | Senate passed Sub B in concurrence | |
2012-06-06 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/07/2012) | |
2012-06-05 | House passed Sub B | |
2012-05-30 | Placed on House Calendar (06/05/2012) | |
2012-05-30 | Committee recommends passage of Sub B | |
2012-05-25 | Scheduled for consideration (05/30/2012) | |
2012-05-16 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-05-11 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/16/2012) | |
2012-05-09 | Referred to House H.E.W. | |
2012-05-09 | Senate passed Sub A | |
2012-05-03 | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/09/2012) | |
2012-05-02 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2012-04-30 | Scheduled for consideration (05/02/2012) | |
2012-04-11 | Committee continued | |
2012-04-06 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2012) | |
2012-02-14 | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/SenateText12/S2361.pdf |