RI S2334 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates an energy assistance program within the governor's energy assistance office with incentives for regular payments and conservation.
Title
Low-income Energy Cost Assistance
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Paul Jabour [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] |
Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2018) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/SenateText18/S2334.pdf |